AZ HB2271 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Universities; commercial paper
Title
Universities; commercial paper
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House Banking and Financial Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 238 | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | House | House final reading , voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2016-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House BFS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House BFS Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House BFS Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |