AZ HB2263 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Certified public accountants
Title
Certified public accountants
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Chapter 136 | |
2014-04-22 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | House | House final reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-3-0) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2014-02-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |