AZ HB2249 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 322
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle registration; nonresidents; penalty
Title
Vehicle registration; nonresidents; penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 322 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-10-1-0) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-13-2-0) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |