AZ HB2244 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Chapter 17
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

AHCCCS; dental services; Native Americans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AHCCCS; dental services; Native Americans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23SenateChapter 17
2020-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2020-03-16HouseTransmit to House
2020-03-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (25-2-3-0)
2020-03-16SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-03-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-03-09SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-09SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-04SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2020-02-25SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2020-02-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-23HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
362907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
362939Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72869
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2244p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2244h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0017.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72869&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72869&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72869&billStatusActionId=193139&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72869&billStatusActionId=193573&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72869&billStatusActionId=193640&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72869&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72869&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72869&billStatusActionId=195821&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback