AZ HB2244 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Initiatives; standard of review; handbook

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Initiatives; standard of review; handbook

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senator Quezada to include the Quezada #3 flr amend (ref Approp) (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Senator Quezada to include the Quezada #2 flr amend (ref Approp) (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-14SenateChapter 151
2017-04-14SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-13SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-13HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (34-23-3-0)
2017-04-13HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-13HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-12HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-12SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2017-04-12SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-04-12SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-04-12SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-04-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-03SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-28SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2017-03-16SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-23SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-22HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2017-02-20HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-20HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-15HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133112Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68759
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2244p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2244h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2244s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0151.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2244lesko.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2244approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2244rules.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2244montenegro1012.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2244montenegro1001.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2244quezada 525.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2244quezada702.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2244quezada557.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68759&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68759&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=175453&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68759&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68759&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176939&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176941&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176940&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176944&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176982&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68759&billStatusActionId=176989&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback