AZ HB2241 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides
Title
Schools; instruction; Holocaust; genocides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 418 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-0-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |