AZ HB2237 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Actions for debt; spouses
Title
Actions for debt; spouses
Sponsors
Rep. John Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-03-04 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-30-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-13 | House | Prefile |