AZ HB2235 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dental therapy; regulation; licensure

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dental therapy; regulation; licensure

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 296
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-03SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-05-03HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (47-13-0-0)
2018-05-03HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-24HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-19HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-04-18SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-04-17SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-17SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-04-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-21SenateSenate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2018-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-15HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-13HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-12HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-12HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
48529Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70010
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2235p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2235h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2235s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0296.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.2235kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.22350231.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2235gov.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2235barto0858.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70010&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70010&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70010&billStatusActionId=180853&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70010&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70010&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70010&billStatusActionId=183313&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70010&billStatusActionId=183347&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70010&billStatusActionId=183719&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70010&billStatusActionId=183818&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback