AZ HB2232 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Competency examinations; records; appointments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Competency examinations; records; appointments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-24SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2020-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-13SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-13HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2020-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-29HouseHouse JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-22HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-21HouseAssigned to House JUD Committee
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
134503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
134505Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback