AZ HB2226 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Compact; balanced budget; convention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Compact; balanced budget; convention

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateChapter 121
2017-03-30SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-28SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-27HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-27SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2017-03-14SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-14SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-13SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-13SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-07SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2017-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-27SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading None voting: (33-25-2-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House FPRPP Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68747
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2226p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2226h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0121.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68747&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68747&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68747&billStatusActionId=174534&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68747&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68747&billStatusActionId=174489&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68747&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68747&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68747&billStatusActionId=176713&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback