AZ HB2221 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; controlled substances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; controlled substances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-16 Chapter 52
2014-04-16 Governor Signed
2014-04-15 Transmitted to Governor
2014-04-15HouseHouse final reading , voting: (60-0-0-0)
2014-04-15HouseHouse Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2014-04-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-08SenateTransmit to House
2014-04-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0)
2014-04-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-04-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2014-04-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2014-03-17SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2014-02-25SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2014-03-05SenateSenate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2014-02-26SenateReferred to Senate CEM Committee
2014-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2014-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2014-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate CEM Committee
2014-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2014-02-24HouseTransmit to Senate
2014-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2014-02-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2014-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2014-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0)
2014-01-22HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2014-02-04HouseHouse IR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-1-0)
2014-01-23HouseReferred to House IR Committee
2014-01-23HouseHouse read second time
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2014-01-22HouseAssigned to House IR Committee
2014-01-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=HB2221
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/laws/0052.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.2221-p1-allen.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/h.2221-p1-lovas.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2221-ir.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/h.2221-f2-fann.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/proposed/s.2221243.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/adopted/s.2221cem.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.hir.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.scem.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/hb2221.hfinal.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback