AZ HB2216 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibited firearm tracking; classification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited firearm tracking; classification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House of Representatives - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House of Representatives - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House of Representatives - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House of Representatives - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-15SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-25-1-0)
2017-02-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-25HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133122New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68704
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2216p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2216h.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2216kavanagh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2216gov.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68704&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68704&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68704&billStatusActionId=174227&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68704&billStatusActionId=174167&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68704&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68704&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback