AZ HB2215 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Chapter 70
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Veterinary medical examining board; continuation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterinary medical examining board; continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateChapter 70
2018-03-23SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-19HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-02-26SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0)
2018-02-19SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-15SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-08SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-08HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0)
2018-02-06HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-06HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-05HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-05HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-25HouseHouse LARA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-17HouseAssigned to House LARA Committee
2018-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
413018.02Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
413026.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69979
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2215p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2215h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0070.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69979&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69979&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69979&billStatusActionId=180558&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69979&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69979&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69979&billStatusActionId=182558&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback