AZ HB2211 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political subdivisions; volunteers; noxious weeds
Title
Political subdivisions; volunteers; noxious weeds
Sponsors
Sen. Olivia Bedford [D] | Rep. William Konopnicki [R] | Rep. Robert Meza [D] | Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Consent Calendar March 31, 2010 @ 11:42 AM | |
2010-04-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House GOV Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |