AZ HB2210 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-10 - Chapter 437
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School functions; food; beverages
Title
School functions; food; beverages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-10 | Senate | Chapter 437 |
2021-07-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (48-8-4-0) |
2021-06-30 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-20 | House | House minority caucus |
2021-04-20 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-6-0-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-0-0) |
2021-02-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Beverages
Constitution Of Arizona (h)
Department Of Education (h)
Education - Title 15
Food
School District Governing Board
School Functions
Constitution Of Arizona (h)
Department Of Education (h)
Education - Title 15
Food
School District Governing Board
School Functions