AZ HB2201 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sovereign authority; commandeering; prohibition; exception
Title
Sovereign authority; commandeering; prohibition; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate Federalism, Mandates and Fiscal Responsibility Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-15-1-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate FMFR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FMFR Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-27-2-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-19 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-0-3-0) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |