AZ HB2200 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Community notification; form of notice

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community notification; form of notice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-04SenateChapter 135
2017-04-04SenateGovernor Signed
2017-03-30SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-03-30HouseTransmit to House
2017-03-30SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2017-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-02-27SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-10SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-09HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-02-01HouseHouse JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-17HouseAssigned to House JPS Committee
2017-01-17HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133825Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68695
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2200p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2200h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0135.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2200judiciary and public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2200farnsworth e.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68695&billStatusActionId=174556&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68695&billStatusActionId=174539&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68695&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68695&billStatusActionId=176786&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback