AZ HB2187 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Chapter 170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DUI; administrative suspension; license revocation
Title
DUI; administrative suspension; license revocation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Chapter 170 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate TAT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TAT Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |