AZ HB2165 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-24 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Prisoners; eligibility
Title
Prisoners; eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Criminal Justice Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-9-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House CJR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House CJR Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Arrests
Communities
Criminal Code - Title 13
Eligibility
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Release
State Government - Title 41
Communities
Criminal Code - Title 13
Eligibility
Prisoners
Prisons And Prisoners - Title 31
Release
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 4414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
31 | 418 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |