AZ HB2157 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-02 - Referred to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Native Americans; delayed birth certificates
Title
Native Americans; delayed birth certificates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |