AZ HB2152 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-04 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Fire district boundary changes
Title
Fire district boundary changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0-0) |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2014-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |