AZ HB2152 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-6)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voluntary remediation program; continuation
Title
Voluntary remediation program; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Ableser [D] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Rep. Cecil Ash [R] | Rep. Ray Barnes [R] |
Rep. Tom Boone [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] | Rep. Sam Crump [R] |
Rep. Martha Garcia [D] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Debbie Lesko [R] |
Rep. Lucy Mason [R] | Sen. John McComish [R] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Rep. Ben Miranda [D] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Sen. Michele Reagan [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
Sen. Anna Tovar [D] | Rep. Rae Waters [D] | Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-07 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Consent Calendar March 31, 2010 @ 11:42 AM | |
2010-04-06 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (50-7-3-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-13 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House ENV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-14 | House read second time | |
2010-01-13 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in House and read first time |