AZ HB2147 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility; unemployment benefits
Title
Eligibility; unemployment benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-30 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Governor Signed | |
2013-03-26 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-03-26 | House | House final reading , voting: (34-24-2-0) |
2013-03-26 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-02-21 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-23-1-0) |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-05 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-04 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | House COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |