AZ HB2145 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Household goods; unlawful moving practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Household goods; unlawful moving practices

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateChapter 224
2017-05-01SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-25SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-25HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (56-0-3-0)
2017-04-25HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-19HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-18HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2017-04-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-28SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-20SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-14HouseHouse third reading None voting: (60-0-0-0)
2017-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2017-02-07HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-07HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-06HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-06HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-31HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68627
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2145p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2145h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2145s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0224.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.2145petersen.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2145comps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2145petersen0923.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=174730&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=174532&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=174728&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68627&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=176998&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=177047&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=177202&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68627&billStatusActionId=177209&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback