AZ HB2131 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax adjudications; attorney fees
Title
Tax adjudications; attorney fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | Chapter 234 | |
2015-04-09 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-04-01 | House | House final reading , voting: (38-21-1-0) |
2015-04-01 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-1-1-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-04 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0) |
2015-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2015-02-17 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-17 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-16 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2015-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |