AZ HB2124 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chapter 416
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
CTEDs; average daily membership
Title
CTEDs; average daily membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | Senate | Chapter 416 |
2021-07-09 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-30 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-7-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-15 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-10 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-20 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-19 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Average Daily Membership
Career Technical Education Districts
Charter Schools
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Governing Board
Legislative Findings
Legislative Intent
School Year
Career Technical Education Districts
Charter Schools
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Governing Board
Legislative Findings
Legislative Intent
School Year
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 341.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |