AZ HB2124 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - House TECH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - House TECH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Online content; publishers; liability
Title
Online content; publishers; liability
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House Technology Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | House TECH Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Assigned to House TECH Committee |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefile |