AZ HB2123 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Chapter 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Corporation commission; conflict of interest

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation commission; conflict of interest

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 31 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-17 Chapter 289
2016-05-17 Governor Signed
2016-05-06 Transmitted to Governor
2016-05-06SenateTransmit to House
2016-05-05SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2016-05-03SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2016-05-03SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-05-03SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-24SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended
2016-03-09SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-17SenateSenate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1)
2016-03-10SenateReferred to Senate JUD Committee
2016-03-10SenateSenate read second time
2016-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-03-09SenateAssigned to Senate JUD Committee
2016-03-09SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-03-07HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-03-07HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-23-3-1)
2016-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-03-01HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-01HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0)
2016-02-22HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-02-24HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-4-2-0-0)
2016-02-23HouseReferred to House APPROP Committee
2016-02-23HouseHouse read second time
2016-02-22HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-02-22HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2016-02-22HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2123
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0289.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2123allen.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2123allen2.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/h.2123appropriations.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/s.2123rul.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/adopted/2123driggs1050.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.happrop.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.sjud.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.sthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.hfinal.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2123.hfinal.2.asp

Bill Comments

feedback