AZ HB2121 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Election pamphlet submittals; identification required
Title
Election pamphlet submittals; identification required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-01-09 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Education - Title 15
Informational Election Pamphlets
Initiative, Referendum And Recall - Title 19
Public Finances - Title 35
Informational Election Pamphlets
Initiative, Referendum And Recall - Title 19
Public Finances - Title 35
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |