AZ HB2113 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Charitable contribution; deduction; inflation adjustment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charitable contribution; deduction; inflation adjustment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateSenate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0)
2021-02-22SenateSenate read second time
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-02-18SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-02SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-02HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (44-15-0-0)
2021-02-01HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-20HouseHouse WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House WM Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74502
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2113p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2113h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2113epstein.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480604
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480912
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480905
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/483793
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486056
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486170
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74502&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74502&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74502&billStatusActionId=199274&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74502&billStatusActionId=199437&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74502&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2

Bill Comments

feedback