AZ HB2113 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 176
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public restrooms; changing stations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public restrooms; changing stations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateChapter 176
2019-05-07SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-01HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (56-2-2-0)
2019-05-01HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-30HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-25HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-25SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0)
2019-04-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-27SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-26HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-20HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-28HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71195
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2113p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2113h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2113s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0176.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2113barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2113health human services.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.21130323.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2113brophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2113hhs.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2113floorbrophy mcgee.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=187052&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=187086&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71195&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=189106&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=189148&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=189286&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71195&billStatusActionId=189287&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback