AZ HB2112 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-2-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Classroom instruction; race; ethnicity; sex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classroom instruction; race; ethnicity; sex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-23SenateSenate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-2-0)
2022-03-17SenateSenate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2022-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2022-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2022-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate FIN Committee
2022-02-17SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2022-02-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2022-02-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2022-02-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2022-02-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2022-01-25HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-25HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2022-01-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2022-01-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-18HouseHouse read second time
2022-01-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
2022-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2022-01-13HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2022-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15711.01New CodeSee Bill Text
15717.02New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/76499
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2112p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2r/bills/hb2112h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/proposed/S.2112LIVINGSTON.DOCX.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/2R/adopted/S.2112FIN.DOCX.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491650
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/491773
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/493258
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/497634
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76499&billStatusActionId=207499&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=76499&billStatusActionId=207502&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=76499&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments

feedback