AZ HB2102 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - House minority caucus: Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - House minority caucus: Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DNA collection; felony arrests; expungement
Title
DNA collection; felony arrests; expungement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2022-06-15 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2022-06-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-1-1-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |