AZ HB2096 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Natural resources projects; court actions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural resources projects; court actions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateChapter 247
2017-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-26HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-26SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-11-3-0)
2017-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-13SenateSenate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate NREW Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-23HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
2017-01-24HouseHouse EENR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House EENR Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37108New CodeSee Bill Text
371308New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68556
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2096p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2096h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0247.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2096energy environment and natural resources.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2096barton.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2096rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68556&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68556&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68556&billStatusActionId=175700&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68556&billStatusActionId=175669&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68556&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68556&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68556&billStatusActionId=177245&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback