AZ HB2091 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 317
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TANF; SNAP; finger imaging; repeal

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF; SNAP; finger imaging; repeal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 317
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-10SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-10HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-10SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0)
2017-05-10SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-05-10SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-10SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-05-10SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-15SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2017-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2017-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-06SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-06HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (40-18-2-0)
2017-02-02HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-31HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-01-30HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-01-30HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-01-19HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-01-17HouseHouse read second time
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-01-12HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
46217Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
46218Repealed CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/68551
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2091p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2091h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0317.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68551&billStatusActionId=174223&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68551&billStatusActionId=174162&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=68551&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68551&billStatusActionId=177591&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=68551&billStatusActionId=177592&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback