AZ HB2086 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
County school superintendents; qualifications
Title
County school superintendents; qualifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-16 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-09 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2024-01-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2023-12-21 | House | Prefile |