AZ HB2086 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - House Consent Calendar January 28, 2013 @ 3:57 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-28 - House Consent Calendar January 28, 2013 @ 3:57 PM
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parking meters; operational check
Title
Parking meters; operational check
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-28 | House | House Consent Calendar January 28, 2013 @ 3:57 PM |
2013-01-28 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to House GOV Committee |
2013-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |