AZ HB2085 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter 78
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; emergency epinephrine administration

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; emergency epinephrine administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateChapter 78
2018-03-27SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-21SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-21HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-21SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-13SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-12SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-12SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-08SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2018-02-20SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-19SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-19SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-14SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-14HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-02-08HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2018-01-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-30HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-01-29HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-01-29HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-01-10HouseHouse read second time
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-01-09HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2018-01-04HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69756
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2085p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2085h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0078.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69756&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69756&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69756&billStatusActionId=180587&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69756&billStatusActionId=180679&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69756&billStatusActionId=180680&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69756&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69756&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69756&billStatusActionId=182603&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback