AZ HB2073 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to Senate NRRA Committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to Senate NRRA Committee
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Animal abuse; prohibited animal ownership
Title
Animal abuse; prohibited animal ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRRA Committee |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-12-4-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |