AZ HB2064 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Transmitted to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal jet fuel; excise tax
Title
Municipal jet fuel; excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Motion Representative Allen moved that the House refer HB 2064 for Additional COW. Motion passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Motion Representative Allen moved that the House refer HB 2064 for Additional COW. Motion passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-23 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (36-20-4-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | House concurs |
2017-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-03-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Chapter 50 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-02-07 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-06 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-01-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2017-01-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-11 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 306 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |