AZ HB2061 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

CTEDs; nonprofits; postsecondary institutions; agreements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CTEDs; nonprofits; postsecondary institutions; agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-24SenateSenate ED Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-18SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2021-03-17SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2021-03-17SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-01-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-01-28HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2021-01-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-01-25HouseHouse consent calendar
2021-01-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-20HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-19HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-14HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2021-01-08HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15393Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74403
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2061p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2061h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/s.2061gowan2.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480595
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/480957
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/481842
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488174
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74403&billStatusActionId=198583&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74403&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3

Bill Comments 750

feedback