AZ HB2055 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Penalties; civil traffic violation
Title
Penalties; civil traffic violation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Pawlik motion to include the Pawlik Floor amendment - failed (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Pawlik motion to include the Pawlik Floor amendment - failed (Y: 28 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House motion to amend |
2020-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-16 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-12-16 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1604 | New Code | See Bill Text |