AZ HB2051 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Informed consent; pelvic examinations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Informed consent; pelvic examinations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-23 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-12-13HousePrefile

Subjects


Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback