AZ HB2048 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legislative vacancies; appointment; requirements
Title
Legislative vacancies; appointment; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-25 | House | House LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefile |