AZ HB2043 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Legal tender exchange; tax exclusion
Title
Legal tender exchange; tax exclusion
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Jay Lawrence [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-1-2-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |