AZ HB2040 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-29 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Surveys; land divisions; county regulation
Title
Surveys; land divisions; county regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-29 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-17-0-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2021-02-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-26 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefile |