AZ HB2030 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

ADOT; ports of entry; reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADOT; ports of entry; reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-10SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-03-10SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-17HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-11HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-11HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-10HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-05HouseHouse PS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-16HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-13HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2020-01-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-11-19HousePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28369Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72521
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2030p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2030h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2030payne.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2030public safety.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72521&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72521&billStatusActionId=193319&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72521&billStatusActionId=193634&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback