AZ HB2029 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Chapter 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commerce; masks; barbering; cosmetology; licensing
Title
Commerce; masks; barbering; cosmetology; licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 334 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2021-05-03 | House | House concurs |
2021-04-29 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2021-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-01-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-01-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-01-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-01-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-13 | House | House GE Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-12-29 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Barbering And Cosmetology Board
Barbers And Cosmetologists
Consolidation
Education - Title 15
Licenses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Barbers And Cosmetologists
Consolidation
Education - Title 15
Licenses
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
State Government - Title 41
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1851 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 302 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 303 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 305 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 324 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 512.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 574 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3022.23 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3026.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 6852 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |