AZ HB2026 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Chapter 223
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of state; omnibus
Title
Secretary of state; omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 223 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-25 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (45-11-3-0) |
2017-04-25 | House | House concurs |
2017-04-11 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-11 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-01-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-01-30 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-10 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-01-05 | House | Prefile |
Subjects
Athlete Agent
Cities And Towns
Education
Omnibus
Property
Public Lands
Public Notice
Secretary Of State
State Forester
State Library
Trade And Commerce
Cities And Towns
Education
Omnibus
Property
Public Lands
Public Notice
Secretary Of State
State Forester
State Library
Trade And Commerce
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1762 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1763 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1764 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1765 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1766 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1767 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1768 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1769 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1770 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1774 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 1776 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 128 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1309 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 1303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 151.25 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1443 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1460 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1460.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1749 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1750 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 956 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |