AZ HB2023 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-09 - Chapter 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Delivery; early ballots; limitation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delivery; early ballots; limitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-09 Chapter 5
2016-03-09 Governor Signed
2016-03-09 Transmitted to Governor
2016-03-09SenateTransmit to House
2016-03-09SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0)
2016-03-09SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2016-03-08SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-08SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2016-03-07SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2016-02-16SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-24SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2016-02-17SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-17SenateSenate read second time
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2016-02-16SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2016-02-05HouseTransmit to Senate
2016-02-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (34-23-3-0)
2016-02-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2016-02-02HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-02HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2016-02-01HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-1-0)
2016-01-11HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2016-01-25HouseHouse ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1-0)
2016-01-12HouseReferred to House ELECT Committee
2016-01-12HouseHouse read second time
2016-01-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2016-01-11HouseAssigned to House ELECT Committee
2016-01-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=115&Bill_Number=HB2023
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/laws/0005.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/h.2023clark.doc.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/proposed/s.2023mq.doc.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.helect.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.hrules.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.hmotion.11.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.hthird.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.sgov.1.asp
Roll Callhttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/52leg/2r/bills/hb2023.sthird.1.asp

Bill Comments

feedback